Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Bank Of Eastern Washington, A Branch Of Bank Of Eastern Oregon, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Reuter, Joseph Todd, against Gordon Brothers Cellars Inc, Gordon, Jeffrey J, Gordon, Vicki, I-Max Llc, Kamiak Vineyards Inc, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, WA, . Franklin County, WA Superior Courts with David L. Petersen presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid L. Petersen Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 29, 2020 |
CategoryCol Collection |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationFranklin County, WA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service TO DON BOYD, ROGER BAILEY, AND JOHN O'LEARY |
|
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO APPOINT GENERAL RECEIVER FOR I-MAX, LLC. |
|
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Uncontested Resolution | |
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing Stricken In Court Other Reason | |
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing TO APPOINT RECEIVER Judge: Petersen, David L |
|
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Note for Motion Docket | |
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service TO DON BOYD & JOHN O'LEARY |
|
April 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service TO JOHN O'LEARY, DON BOYD, AND ROGER BAILEY |
|
April 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit ED ROLLINS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO APPOINT GENERAL RECEIVER FOR I-MAX, LLC |
|
April 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion TO APPOINT GENERAL RECEIVER FOR I-MAX, LLC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.