Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Fowler, Dawna, Fowler, Mark, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Myers, Michael David, against Apollo Inc, A Washington Corporation, Sitler, Charles, Sitler, Jane Doe, represented by Scholnick, Bryan D, in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, WA, . Franklin County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 09, 2020 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFranklin County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Return to Active Status | |
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Swanberg, Samuel P |
|
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice AND STIPULATION Judge: Swanberg, Samuel P |
|
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement and Auth for Clerk to Strike Trial Date | |
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation to Arbitrator EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR ARBITRATION HEARING DATE |
|
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer and Affirmative Defense | |
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Statement of Arbitrability | |
November 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Demand for Jury 12 Person | |
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.