Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Erickson, Jason, filed a(n) General Adminstrative - Administrative case represented by Harvey, Alan Edward, against Franklin County, A Washington Governmental Entity, represented by Jenny, Frank William, Ii, in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, WA, . Franklin County, WA Superior Courts with Samuel P. Swanberg presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSamuel P. Swanberg Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 28, 2020 |
CategoryPra Public Records Act |
Last RefreshedAugust 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationFranklin County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Adminstrative |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Swanberg, Samuel P |
|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Stipulated WITH PREJUDICE Judge: Swanberg, Samuel P |
|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss STIPULATED |
|
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
August 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
July 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service TO TIM ANDERSON, AGENT OF FRANKLIN COUNTY AUDITOR |
|
July 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Complaint FOR DISCLOSURE OF PUBLIC RECORDS |
|
July 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons | |
July 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Information Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.