Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Convoy Supply Inc., filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Kelly, Benjamin E, against T4Power, Llc., represented by Hames, William L., in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, WA, . Franklin County, WA Superior Courts with Joseph M. Burrowes presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph M. Burrowes Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 28, 2020 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationFranklin County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Release OF WRIT OF GARNISHMENT - PLAINTIFF |
|
April 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Answer to Writ of Garnishment | |
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Writ of Garnishment | |
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit OF GARNISHMENT |
|
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Judgment BASED IN SETTLEMENT AND RELEASE AGREEMENT Judge: Burrowes, Joseph M |
|
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion and Affidavit Declaration IN SUPPORT OF JUDGEMENT BASED ON SETTLEMENT AND RELEASE AGREEMENT |
|
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Settled by Parties Agreed Judgment No Trial | |
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Burrowes, Joseph M |
|
July 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Non-Jury Trial Length TBD |
|
July 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Management Hearing Time TBD Judge: Hevel, David R |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.