Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Bell Veal, Llc., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Rosenblum, Jacob, against John And Jane Does Numbers 1-20, Mccary, Deanna L., Mccary Meats, Llc., Mccary, Rick A., Washington State Department Of Labor And Industries, (total of 5) See All represented by Lee, Angie, in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, WA, . Franklin County, WA Superior Courts with Carrie L. Runge presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCarrie L. Runge Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 13, 2020 |
CategoryFor Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationFranklin County, WA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
July 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Stay Regarding Bankruptcy | |
July 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Hearing Stricken In Court Other Reason | |
July 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR Judge: Runge, Carrie L |
|
July 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
July 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Note for Motion Docket | |
July 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Runge, Carrie L |
|
July 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause HEARING SET FOR 07-27-2020 @ 2:30 PM |
|
July 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE |
|
July 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit OF WARD BELL IN SUPPORT OF APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.