Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Connell Oil, Inc., filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Davis, Brian G, against Site Fuel Inc., in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, WA, . Franklin County, WA Superior Courts with Jacqueline Stam presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJacqueline Stam Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 27, 2020 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationFranklin County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing SUPPLEMENTAL PROCEEDINGS Judge: Stam, Jacqueline I |
|
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Shea-Brown, Jacqueline |
|
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing SUPPLEMENTAL PROCEEDINGS Judge: Shea-Brown, Jacqueline |
|
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Issue RE-NOTICE |
|
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Rodriguez, Norma |
|
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing SUPPLEMENTAL PROCEEDINGS Judge: Rodriguez, Norma |
|
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Ruff, Diana N |
|
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing SUPPLEMENTAL PROCEEDINGS Judge: Ruff, Diana N |
|
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Issue |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.