Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Allan Electric, Inc., Central Washington Asphalt, Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Larson, Larry Washburn, O'Leary, John William, against Navigators Ins. Co, Rodriguez, Jane Doe, Rodriguez, Octavio, Shiva Financial, Llc, Vinci Home, Llc, (total of 5) See All represented by Hansen, William Thomas, Klashke, Timothy Gary, Walker, Patrick Craig, in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, WA, . Franklin County, WA Superior Courts with David L. Petersen presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid L. Petersen Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 10, 2020 |
CategoryCol Collection |
Last RefreshedAugust 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationFranklin County, WA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial-12 Length TBD |
|
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Management Hearing | |
October 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Settlement Conference | |
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial-12 Length TBD |
|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Petersen, David L |
|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Amending Case Schedule THIRD AMENDED Judge: Petersen, David L |
|
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Management Hearing | |
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit OF KEVIN ROBERTS RE: DEFAULT/DISMISSAL HEARING |
|
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Petersen, David L |
|
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Petersen, David L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.