Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Senda, Maria T., filed a(n) Admin Appeals - Administrative case against Broetje Orchards, Department Of Labor And Industries, in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, WA, . Franklin County, WA Superior Courts with Jacqueline Stam presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJacqueline Stam Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 20, 2020 |
CategoryAlr Administrative Law Review |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationFranklin County, WA |
Matter TypeAdmin Appeals |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Non-Jury Trial 1 Day |
|
October 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Readiness Hearing Trial Priority Hearing Judge: Holt, Brandon P |
|
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Trial Date & CERTIFICATE OF MAILING |
|
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice OF TRIAL PRIORITY & CERTIFICATE OF MAILING |
|
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Non-Jury Trial 1 Day |
|
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Trial Date NON-JURY MAY 31, 2023 |
|
October 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Stam, Jacqueline I |
|
October 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order for Continuance of Trial Date JOINT STIPULATED Judge: Stam, Jacqueline I |
|
October 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Non-Jury Trial 1 Day |
|
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Management Hearing Time TBD Judge: Petersen, David L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.