Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
The Sherwin-Williams Company, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Siderius, Frank Raymond, against Wesco Insurance Compoany, Bond No. 46Wb096258, Sanchez, Abel Jericho Roa, Evolution Painting Llc., represented by Harrison, Frank Stuart, in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, WA, . Franklin County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2021 |
CategoryCol Collection |
Last RefreshedMay 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationFranklin County, WA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Non-Jury Trial | |
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Conference | |
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal DEFENDANT ABEL JERICO ROA SANCHEZ ONLY Judge: Shea-Brown, Jacqueline |
|
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion to Dismiss | |
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Settlement Conference | |
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Spanner, Bruce A |
|
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Authorizing DISBURSEMENT AND DISMISSAL OF WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY ONLY Judge: Spanner, Bruce A |
|
June 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order of Default AND JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT CONTRACTOR ONLY (EVOLUTION PAINTING LLC.) |
|
June 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Swanberg, Samuel P |
|
June 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit BY PAMELA S. JOHNSON IN SUPPORT OF SUM CERTAIN DUE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.