Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
The Sherwin-Williams Company, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Siderius, Frank Raymond, against Iron Shore Indemnity Inc., Bond No. Sur40013967, Merino Montes, Karina, Tri-Cities Panting & Cleaning Services, Llc., in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, WA, . Franklin County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2020 |
CategoryCol Collection |
Last RefreshedMay 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationFranklin County, WA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Non-Jury Trial | |
December 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Conference | |
November 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Settlement Conference | |
August 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Swanberg, Samuel P |
|
August 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
August 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice AGREED ORDER |
|
August 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT CONTRACTOR ONLY |
|
July 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration of Mailing | |
July 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Note for Motion Docket SET FOR UNDER TEN 08-10-2020 @ 2:30 PM |
|
July 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit OF PAMELA S. JOHNSON IN SUPPORT OF SUM CERTAIN DUE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.