Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case in the jurisdiction of Ferry County, WA, . Ferry County, WA Superior Courts with Jessica Taylor Reeves presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJessica Taylor Reeves Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2021 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 22, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationFerry County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Closure by Clerk | |
June 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Reeves, Jessica T |
|
June 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Clerks Order of Dismissal | |
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Mail Returned Unclaimed | |
May 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Other seeking an order to move forth |
|
January 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition the court for service by the alternative means |
|
January 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Response -to appearance of counsel |
|
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Other Violations of Civil Rights |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.