Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Allegheny Resources Llc, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Kelly, Benjamin E, against Lt Logging Llc Dba Lt Logging & Constance Lynds, in the jurisdiction of Ferry County, WA, . Ferry County, WA Superior Courts with Lech Radzimski presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLech Radzimski Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 05, 2020 |
CategoryFju Foreign Judgment |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationFerry County, WA |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment | |
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer to Writ of Garnishment | |
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Writ of Garnishment | |
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit of Garnishment |
|
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Radzimski, Lech |
|
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Judgment on Answer of Garnishee Defendant | |
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration of Mailing | |
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit re: Non Military service |
|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion and Affidavit Declaration Pla judgement on answer |
|
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer to Writ of Garnishment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.