Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Jordan, Donald, Jordan, Tonia, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Montgomery, Chris Alan, against Ferry County, represented by Scott, Peter Guillum, in the jurisdiction of Ferry County, WA, . Ferry County, WA Superior Courts with Jessica Taylor Reeves presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJessica Taylor Reeves Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 07, 2020 |
CategoryPrp Property Damages |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFerry County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Summary Judgment Hearing Corrected Held on 08/07/2023 |
|
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Summary Judgment Hearing Held on August 7, 2023 |
|
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Summary Judgment @ 1:30PM |
|
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order for Return of Exhibits and or Unopen
Judge: Reeves, Jessica T |
|
July 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Summary Judgment Hearing held 06/26/2023 |
|
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Exhibit List | |
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing to Terminate Preliminary Injunction @ 1:30pm |
|
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Summary Judgment @ 1:30 PM |
|
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Summary Judgement Decision Date Judge: Reeves, Jessica T |
|
June 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Reply in Support of Summary Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.