Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
A.B.C.D. Trust U T D December 23, 1975, Dorsey, Marilyn J., filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case represented by Sampson, Rani K, against 1604.7 Acres Of Real Property In Douglas County Known By Tax Parcel Numbers 25210210002, 25211120000, 26213500001, 26213410002, 252505510002, All Other Persons Unknown Who Claim Any Right, Title, Or Interest In The Properties Described In The Complaint, Brown, Eli, Bruce, Martha, Does 1-75, John, (total of 20) See All represented by Dorsey, Brian John, Ransom, James B., in the jurisdiction of Douglas County, WA, . Douglas County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 01, 2021 |
CategoryQti Quiet Title |
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDouglas County, WA |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Presentation of Order Stip JD and Quieting Title |
|
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Uncontested Resolution | |
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Substitute Marilyn J Dorsey, Trustee and To Drop Roger Dorsey and All John Does |
|
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Quieting One-Third of the Lands Described in the Complaint - Stipulated |
|
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration of Mailing | |
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration of Mailing | |
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration of Mailing | |
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing and Presentment |
|
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit of Joan Dorsey in Support of Motion for Default/Defualt Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.