Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Ratcliff, Charlotte, Ratcliff, Richard, filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case represented by Kane, Corey Michael, against Rimrock Meadows Association, in the jurisdiction of Douglas County, WA, . Douglas County, WA Superior Courts with Henry A. Rawson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHenry A. Rawson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 30, 2020 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDouglas County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Mandate | |
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice
Judge: Rawson, Henry A |
|
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Findings of Dismissal with Prejudice and Stipulation |
|
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing for Sanctions Judge: Rawson, Henry A |
|
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pending Decision
Judge: Rawson, Henry A |
|
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Reply in Support of Motion for CR 11 Sanctions - Defendants' |
|
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit of Scott M Kane Regarding Defendants' Motion for CR 11 Terms |
|
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Response to Defendants' Motion for CR 11 Sanctions and Supporting Declaration of Corey M Kane - Plaintiffs' |
|
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit of Richard Ratcliff and Charlotte Ratcliff in Response to Defendants' Motion for CR 11 Sanctions |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.