Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Hood, Eric, filed a(n) General Adminstrative - Administrative case against Okanogan County, represented by Gecas, David Y, in the jurisdiction of Douglas County, WA, . Douglas County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 04, 2020 |
CategoryPra Public Records Act |
Last RefreshedMay 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationDouglas County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Adminstrative |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
February 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice
Judge: Huber, Brian C |
|
December 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Amended Complaint for Violations of the Public Records Act |
|
December 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Sheriffs Return on Service - Okanogan County Auditor |
|
December 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
December 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Answer to Complaint for Violation of the Public Records Act |
|
December 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
November 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Summons | |
November 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Information Cover Sheet | |
November 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Complaint for Violations of the Public Records Act |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.