Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Huston, Brett, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by West, Warren John, against Shree Balaji, Llc, represented by Behar, Samuel Ben, in the jurisdiction of Douglas County, WA, . Douglas County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 09, 2019 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedMay 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDouglas County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice of all claims and Stipulation |
|
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Huber, Brian C |
|
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Findings Dismissal of All Claims and Stipulation |
|
August 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Statutory Interest in Recovery |
|
August 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit of Warren John West in Support of Status Report |
|
August 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Report Status |
|
August 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
February 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint for Damages |
|
February 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.