Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Meink, Stephanie, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Kane, Corey Michael, against North River Apartments Limited Partnership, represented by Sestero, Robert F., Ii, in the jurisdiction of Douglas County, WA, . Douglas County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2019 |
CategoryPin Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedMay 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDouglas County, WA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Safar, Philip K |
|
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice -Stipulation |
|
August 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Letter from Lacy Kane & Kube in Response to Clerk's Notice for Dismissal |
|
August 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
April 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Answer to Complaint |
|
February 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
January 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
December 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
December 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.