Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Holmes, Brenden, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Volyn, Scott Andrew, against Curry, John Doe, Curry, Shawn, in the jurisdiction of Douglas County, WA, . Douglas County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 25, 2018 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDouglas County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
January 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Report - Status |
|
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
November 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Substitution of Counsel | |
June 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
May 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint 2: COMPLAINT FOR MONEY DAMAGES; |
|
May 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons 3: SUMMONS; |
|
May 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Information Cover Sheet 1: CASE INFORMATION COVER SHEET; |
|
May 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Received -: FILING FEE RECEIVED; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.