Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Flores Perez, Emma Gloria filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Douglas County, WA, . Douglas County, WA Superior Courts with John Hotchkiss presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn Hotchkiss Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 14, 2018 |
CategoryHar Unlawful Harassment |
Last RefreshedOctober 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDouglas County, WA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Sheriffs Return on Service - Madeline |
|
June 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Closed by Court Order After a Hearing | |
June 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order for Protection From Civil Harassment
Judge: Hotchkiss, John |
|
June 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
June 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Anti-Harassment
Judge: Hotchkiss, John |
|
June 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Sheriffs Return on Service - Madeliene Elaina Ramos |
|
May 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing 5: MOTION HEARING; |
|
May 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Denying Motion Petition 4: ORDER DENYING MOTION/PETITION; 06-12-2018DV; PETITION FOR ANTI-HARASSMENT ORDER; |
|
May 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
DV Civil Domestic Violence PETITION FOR ANTI-HARASSMENT ORDER |
|
May 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Return Receipt Certified Mail 3: RETURN RECEIPT - CERTIFIED MAIL TO; MADELEINE RAMOS; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.