Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Galloway, Jason, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Schwab, George Joseph, Ii, against Schwenzer Ii, Gregory, Schwenzer, Jane Doe, represented by Stocker, Steven Robert, in the jurisdiction of Douglas County, WA, . Douglas County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 25, 2019 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedMay 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDouglas County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Hotchkiss, John |
|
February 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
February 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice - Stipulation |
|
July 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer - Defendants Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint |
|
June 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
June 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Return of Service | |
May 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint 2: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; |
|
May 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons 3: SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; |
|
May 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Received -: FILING FEE RECEIVED; |
|
May 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Information Cover Sheet 1: CASE INFORMATION COVER SHEET; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.