Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Weed, Lisa, filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case represented by Winkles, Erin Helen, against All Persons Unknown, Claiming Any Legal Or Quitable Right, Title, Estate, Lien, Or Interest In The Property, Loandepot.Com Llc, Pike, Jack Burl, in the jurisdiction of Cowlitz County, WA, . Cowlitz County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 16, 2021 |
CategoryQti Quiet Title |
Last RefreshedAugust 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCowlitz County, WA |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Closure by Clerk | |
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Clerks Order of Dismissal
Judge: Bashor, Gary |
|
October 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Intent to Withdraw | |
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Absence Unavailability | |
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration Affidavit | |
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Appearance Pro Se | |
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Amended Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.