Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Brennan, Theresa, Hoetker, Frank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Ammons, Darrel S., Jr, against Contractors Bond & Insurance Co, Waters, Chris, represented by Jackson, Jacob Peter, in the jurisdiction of Cowlitz County, WA, . Cowlitz County, WA Superior Courts with Marilyn K. Haan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMarilyn K. Haan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 12, 2021 |
CategoryCbc Contractor Bond Complaint |
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationCowlitz County, WA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice
Judge: Haan, Marilyn K |
|
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing CT SIGNS ORDER OF DISMISSAL Judge: Haan, Marilyn K |
|
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Hearing Original Order for Presentation Provided to Ct Admin AG Judge: Haan, Marilyn K |
|
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Note for Motion Docket | |
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion to Dismiss | |
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Denying Motion Petition for Voluntary Dismissal Judge: Bashor, Gary |
|
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer to Pltf's Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.