Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Bc Traffic Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Frohlich, Daniel J, against C & R Tractor & Landscaping Inc, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Western Surety Co, represented by Friedrich, Paul Keane, Ryan, Shawn Patrick, in the jurisdiction of Cowlitz County, WA, . Cowlitz County, WA Superior Courts with David A. Nelson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid A. Nelson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 29, 2021 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationCowlitz County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement |
|
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Mail Returned Unclaimed | |
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Status Report of Case-Plaintiff's |
|
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer and Affirmative Defense to Counterclaim |
|
December 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer and Affirmative Defense | |
December 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Default Order for presentation provided to Court Admin -mb Judge: Nelson, David A |
|
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer Affirmative Defense and Counter or Cross Claim | |
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Note for Motion Docket | |
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion for Default |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.