Case Last Refreshed: 6 hours ago
Allstate Vehicle And Property Insurance Company, filed a(n) Tto Tort - Other case represented by Shumsky, George M, against Oetiker Inc, represented by Farley, Timothy Joseph, Wallace, Gregory G, in the jurisdiction of Cowlitz County, WA, . Cowlitz County, WA Superior Courts Superior with Gary B. Bashor presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGary B. Bashor Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 25, 2021 |
CategoryTto Tort - Other |
Last RefreshedApril 24, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationCowlitz County, WA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice
Judge: Bashor, Gary |
|
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Arbitration Award | |
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Firm Name Change |
|
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Arbitration Hearing Date; Amended |
|
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Arbitration Hearing Date |
|
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel | |
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appointment as Arbitrator
Judge: Bashor, Gary |
|
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Proposed Arbitrators | |
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.