Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
American Express National Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Mclellan, Aaron, against The Turpin Consulting Group Inc, Turpin, James, in the jurisdiction of Cowlitz County, WA, . Cowlitz County, WA Superior Courts with David A. Nelson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid A. Nelson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 30, 2021 |
CategoryCol Collection |
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationCowlitz County, WA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice
Judge: Nelson, David A |
|
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion to Dismiss | |
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Closure by Clerk | |
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Clerks Order of Dismissal
Judge: Bashor, Gary |
|
October 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Mail Returned Unclaimed | |
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice Re Dependent of a Person in Military Service | |
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons | |
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Complaint for Monies Due and Owing |
|
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Information Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.