Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Winter, Kimberly L, Winter, Steven L, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Dick, Margaret M, Nelson, David Allen, against Cope, Jesse, Jmc Investments Llc, Re Max Premier Group, represented by Mcreary, Craig Michael, in the jurisdiction of Cowlitz County, WA, . Cowlitz County, WA Superior Courts with Patricia M. Fassett presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePatricia M. Fassett Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 05, 2021 |
CategoryCol Collection |
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationCowlitz County, WA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
June 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice
Judge: Fassett, Patricia M |
|
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Default
Judge: Baldwin, Chelsea |
|
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Answer to Complaint |
|
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Note for Motion Docket | |
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion for Default | |
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel | |
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.