Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Geist, Blake, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Dick, Margaret M, Nelson, David Allen, against Nylund Holmes Inc, represented by Mcreary, Craig Michael, in the jurisdiction of Cowlitz County, WA, . Cowlitz County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 17, 2020 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationCowlitz County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Intent to Withdraw | |
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel | |
October 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer | |
May 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
April 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service Julie Nylund- Registered Agent |
|
March 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons | |
March 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Complaint for Damages |
|
March 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Information Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.