Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Thomas, Herbert, Thomas, Sheri, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Ammons, Darrel S., Jr, against Nylund Inc, represented by Mcreary, Craig Michael, in the jurisdiction of Cowlitz County, WA, . Cowlitz County, WA Superior Courts with David A. Nelson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid A. Nelson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 16, 2020 |
CategoryPin Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedOctober 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCowlitz County, WA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Absence Unavailability | |
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Presentation of Order
Judge: Nelson, David A |
|
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Re Expert Witnesses Judge: Nelson, David A |
|
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing CT GRANTS MOTION; CT SETS PRESENTATION TO 03/22/2023 AT 2:00PM Judge: Nelson, David A |
|
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing Resolve Issue Re: Expert Witnesses Judge: Nelson, David A |
|
March 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Memorandum Regarding Claim of Waiver; Rebuttal |
|
March 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit in Reponse to Motion to Resolve the Issue Raised by the Defendant that Plaintiffs Waived Expert Witnesses |
|
March 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Response to Motion to Plaintiffs motion to Resolve the Issue Raised by the Defendant that Plaintiffs Waived Expert Witness |
|
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Findings | |
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.