Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Collins, Lana J, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Edwards, Scott W, against Baird, Robert, Chapman, Martin Ray, Gaddis, Annie Marie Astrid, Hoxit, Deborah Lee, John And Jane Does 1-10, (total of 10) See All represented by Giampa, Kelly A, in the jurisdiction of Cowlitz County, WA, . Cowlitz County, WA Superior Courts with Patricia M. Fassett presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePatricia M. Fassett Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2020 |
CategoryWde Wrongful Death |
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCowlitz County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice
Judge: Fassett, Patricia M |
|
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Dismissing Party
Judge: Bashor, Gary |
|
May 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Sheriffs Return on Service Wendy Keegan |
|
May 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer and Affirmative Defense | |
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel | |
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
January 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Sheriffs Return on Service Wendy Keegan |
|
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons | |
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Complaint for Abuse of a Vulnerable Adult, Negligence, Wrongful Death, and Breach of Contract |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.