Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Richter, Jody M, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Andersen, Matthew J, against Bunnage, Daniel, Morisse Logging Inc, represented by Webster, Ronald Francis, in the jurisdiction of Cowlitz County, WA, . Cowlitz County, WA Superior Courts with Stephen M. Warning presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen M. Warning Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2020 |
CategoryPin Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedMarch 06, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCowlitz County, WA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Warning, Stephen M |
|
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial-12 6 DAY Motion to Dimiss Daniel Bunnage Judge: Scudder, Thad |
|
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial-12 6 DAY |
|
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial-12 6 DAY |
|
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion in Limine |
|
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Note for Motion Docket Cannot be set on Trial Calendar; to be heard morning of trial -mb |
|
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Findings Order in Limine |
|
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion in Limine | |
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Findings Order on Motion for Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice - Daniel Brunnage |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.