Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
J.M.S. Farms Inc., Mccauley, Larhonda, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Corporations I-X, I-X, Does, M 4 Construction, Myrick, Merle, Nicoara Electric Llc, (total of 8) See All represented by Kirkpatrick, Paul L., Stowe, Daniel E, in the jurisdiction of Columbia County, WA, . Columbia County, WA Superior Courts with Scott D. Gallina presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeScott D. Gallina Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 19, 2018 |
CategoryPrp Property Damages |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationColumbia County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Absence Unavailability | |
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit GR 17 |
|
February 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Receipts $250 Jury Demand Fee |
|
February 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Demand for Jury 12 Person | |
July 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Firm Name Change (from Law Offices of Kathryn Reynolds Morton, located at Liberty Lake, WA, is now know as the Law Offices of Mark Dietzler) |
|
May 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Answer and Affirmative Defense of Defendants Sebastian Nicoara & Nico Enterprises, LLC |
|
April 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Answer to Complaint |
|
February 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Gallina, Scott D |
|
January 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion and Affidavit Declaration to Compel Answers to Interrogatories |
|
January 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Note for Motion Docket |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.