Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Zoning - Property case in the jurisdiction of Columbia County, WA, . Columbia County, WA Superior Courts with Scott D. Gallina presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeScott D. Gallina Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 11, 2016 |
CategoryLupa Land Use Petition Act |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationColumbia County, WA |
Matter TypeZoning |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Potential Unavailability of Counsel (AG's) |
|
May 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Courts Decision on Motion for Relief from Judgment Judge: Gallina, Scott D |
|
April 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Reply Support of Motion for Relief from Order |
|
April 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Gallina, Scott D |
|
April 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Show Cause Re: Relief from Order Judge: Gallina, Scott D |
|
April 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Response to Order to Show Cause |
|
April 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Re: Relief from Order Judge: Gallina, Scott D |
|
April 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
Receipts Ex Parte Fee |
|
March 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit of Patrick R. Moberg in Suprt of Mot for Relief from Order |
|
March 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion & Memorandum for Relief from Order Pursuant to CR 60(b)(11) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.