Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Korslund, Amy Elizabeth filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Columbia County, WA, . Columbia County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 20, 2017 |
CategoryDvp Domestic Violence |
Last RefreshedMay 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationColumbia County, WA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Sheriffs Return on Service | |
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Return of Service | |
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Burns, Brooke J |
|
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Modifying Terminating Terms of Protective Order
Judge: Burns, Brooke J |
|
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing Motion to Terminate Protection Order Judge: Burns, Brooke J |
|
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Return of Service | |
March 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
March 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Confidential Information Form | |
March 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion and Affidavit Declaration to Modify/Terminate Order for Protection |
|
March 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Sheriffs Return on Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.