Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Mason, Donald, Mason, Sherry, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Meacham, Toni, against Blom, Bridget, Blom, John, Christy'S, Realty A Div Of Dayton Premier Properties,, Snyder, Garry, Snyder, Jane Doe, (total of 5) See All represented by Grossman, David Scott, Scribner, Tom, in the jurisdiction of Columbia County, WA, . Columbia County, WA Superior Courts with G. Scott Marinella presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeG. Scott Marinella Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 07, 2016 |
CategoryPrp Property Damages |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationColumbia County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Clerks Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution Judge: Marinella, G. Scott |
|
September 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Resolution Dismissal Closure by Clerk for Want of Prosecution |
|
July 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
April 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Response - Matter is still on going and should stay open. |
|
April 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
April 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
November 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Absence Unavailability Between November 30th, 2017 - December 25, 2017 |
|
September 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 13: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
|
September 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Answer and Affirmative Defense 12: ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF; DEFS GARRY & JANE DOE SNYDER &; CHRISTY'S REALTY, A DIV OF DAYTON; PREMIER PROPERTIES, LLC; |
|
September 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Answer 11: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND; RESCISSION OF REAL EST SALE OF DEFS; JOHN & BRIDGET BLOM; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.