Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Consol. Est Of Dougherty, Inc, Dougherty, Douglas D., Dougherty, Katherina M., Wdl Properties, Llc, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case against Asnw, Inc, Barton, George E, Barton Land & Livestock, Llc, Elk Canyon Enterprises, Llc, Literal, Lee Ann, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Columbia County, WA, . Columbia County, WA Superior Courts with Scott D. Gallina presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeScott D. Gallina Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 04, 2016 |
CategoryFju Foreign Judgment |
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationColumbia County, WA |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Receipts Ex Parte Fee $30.00 |
|
February 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Vacating Judgment Only as to Lee Ann Literal Judge: Gallina, Scott D |
|
February 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Release of Judgment Lien | |
January 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Sheriffs Return of Service Not Served | |
November 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
November 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing GEORGE BARTON AND LEE ANN LITERAL JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAMINATION-9:00AM |
|
October 31, 2016 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
October 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Received 15: FILING FEE RECEIVED EX-PARTE FEE; |
|
October 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order 13: ORDER GRANTING MOTION-GEORGE BARTON; |
|
October 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order 14: ORDER GRANTING MOTION-; 11-28-2016C; LEE ANN LITERAL; GEORGE BARTON AND LEE ANN LITERAL; JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAMINATION-9:00AM; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.