Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Melgren, Mark filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Columbia County, WA, . Columbia County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2016 |
CategoryDvp Domestic Violence |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationColumbia County, WA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Denying Motion Petition 13: ORDER DENYING MOTION/PETITION; |
|
February 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
February 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
C Civil Matters HEARING FOR ORDER FOR PROTECTION |
|
February 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing 14: MOTION HEARING; |
|
February 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Sheriffs Return on Service 12: SHERIFF'S RETURN OF SERVICE; |
|
February 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Email 11: EMAIL/S TO ADAMS CO FOR SERVICE; |
|
February 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Reissuing Temporary Protection Order 9: ORD REISSUING TEMP PROTECTION ORDER; 02-17-2016C; HEARING FOR ORDER FOR PROTECTION; |
|
February 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing 10: MOTION HEARING; |
|
February 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
C Civil Matters HEARING ON PETITION FOR PROTECTION |
|
January 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Return of Service not Found 8: RETURN OF SERVICE NOT FOUND; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.