Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Empey, Dale, filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case represented by Baze, Leslie Erin, against Caliber Holdings Llc, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, WA, . Clark County, WA Superior Courts with Nancy N. Retsinas presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNancy N. Retsinas Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2023 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedOctober 26, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Stricken In Court Other Reason | |
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Scheduling Conference
Judge: Retsinas, Nancy N |
|
April 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Scheduling Conference
Judge: Retsinas, Nancy N |
|
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Petition for Removal to US District Court | |
March 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Return of Service | |
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Return of Service | |
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Amended Summons | |
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit OF COUNSEL |
|
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment AMENDED |
|
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Assignment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.