Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Lukyanov, Lyubov, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Callahan, Shaun, against Wright, Perry, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, WA, . Clark County, WA Superior Courts with Emily A. Sheldrick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEmily A. Sheldrick Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2023 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal With Prejudice | |
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Scheduling Conference
Judge: Sheldrick, Emily |
|
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice OF DISMISSAL |
|
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Assignment | |
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons | |
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Information Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.