Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Princeton Property Management, Inc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Kraus, Bradley Steven, against Anderson, William J, Moreno, Taneasha C, represented by Cole, Cassandra Christine, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, WA, . Clark County, WA Superior Courts with Emily A. Sheldrick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEmily A. Sheldrick Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2023 |
CategoryUnd Residential Unlawful Detainer |
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationClark County, WA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Sheriffs Return on Writ | |
April 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Order for Writ of Restitution | |
April 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Writ of Restitution | |
March 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
March 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit P |
|
March 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Unlawful Detainer #1 P/ ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Judge: Sheldrick, Emily |
|
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Citation AMENDED |
|
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Stricken In Court Other Reason | |
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Granting Limited Dissemination | |
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Unlawful Detainer
Judge: Sheldrick, Emily |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.