Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Frg Cove, Llc, Renaissance At 29Th Apartments, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Posner, Quinn Harrison, against Espiritu, Alondra Rosales, Gonzalez-Aguilar, Enrique, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, WA, . Clark County, WA Superior Courts with Emily A. Sheldrick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEmily A. Sheldrick Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2023 |
CategoryUnd Residential Unlawful Detainer |
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationClark County, WA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Sheriffs Return on Writ | |
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Writ of Restitution | |
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Closed by Court Order After a Hearing | |
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Order for Writ of Restitution | |
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law | |
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Unlawful Detainer SHOW CAUSE Judge: Sheldrick, Emily |
|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Posting CORRECTED |
|
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit (P) |
|
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.