Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Davis, Douglas W., Davis, Janet B., filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case represented by Cunningham, Brook L, against Roberts, Don M., Roberts, Mardell A., represented by Murray, Joel Francis, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, WA, . Clark County, WA Superior Courts with Nancy N. Retsinas presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNancy N. Retsinas Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2023 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, WA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment Summary | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Uncontested Resolution | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Granting Summary Judgment | |
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Stricken In Court Other Reason | |
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Presentation of Order
Judge: Retsinas, Nancy N |
|
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Findings | |
June 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Summary Judgment PROPOSED |
|
June 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice OF PRESENTMENT |
|
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Stricken In Court Other Reason |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.