Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Eagle West Insurance Company, filed a(n) Tto Tort - Other case represented by Shumsky, George M, against Team Construction, Llc,, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, WA, . Clark County, WA Superior Courts with Nancy N. Retsinas presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNancy N. Retsinas Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2023 |
CategoryTto Tort - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Scheduling Conference
Judge: Retsinas, Nancy N |
|
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal With Prejudice | |
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Uncontested Resolution | |
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Stipulation | |
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Return of Service not Found | |
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Assignment | |
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.