Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Mclaughlin, Kathleen, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Radecke, Stephanie, against Fisher, Tanner, Tonkin, Amanda, represented by Moody, Benjamin Jacob, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, WA, . Clark County, WA Superior Courts with Emily A. Sheldrick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEmily A. Sheldrick Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2023 |
CategoryUnd Residential Unlawful Detainer |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationClark County, WA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Sheriffs Return on Writ | |
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Writ of Restitution AMENDED |
|
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order for Writ of Restitution AMENDED |
|
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Writ of Restitution | |
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Writ of Restitution | |
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Agreement CR2A |
|
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Uncontested Resolution | |
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Granting Limited Dissemination | |
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion | |
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Order for Writ of Restitution |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.