Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
M2C1 Construction, Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Calderbank, Timothy J., against Thompson, Jessica, Thompson, Kyle L., represented by Conway, Jesse David, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, WA, . Clark County, WA Superior Courts with Emily A. Sheldrick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEmily A. Sheldrick Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2023 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationClark County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Non-Jury Trial 4 DAYS Judge: Sheldrick, Emily |
|
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing #11 STATUS CONFERENCE Judge: Sheldrick, Emily |
|
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration of Mailing | |
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Order | |
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Setting Case Schedule | |
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Setting Case Schedule | |
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Stricken In Court Other Reason | |
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Scheduling Conference
Judge: Sheldrick, Emily |
|
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Joint Status Report | |
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Response (P) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.