Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
The Pacific Nw Group, Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Berry, Matthew Robert, against E-Terra, Llc, E-Terrix, Llc Aka Ecoterix, Llc, The North River Insurance Company, represented by Calderbank, Timothy J., Dishaw, Meredith Eileen, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, WA, . Clark County, WA Superior Courts with Emily A. Sheldrick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEmily A. Sheldrick Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 09, 2022 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationClark County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial-12 5 DAYS Judge: Sheldrick, Emily |
|
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing #11 PRETRIAL STATUS CONFERENCE Judge: Sheldrick, Emily |
|
October 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial-12
Judge: Sheldrick, Emily |
|
September 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing #11 STATUS CONF. Judge: Sheldrick, Emily |
|
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing #3 D/ MT TO CONTINUE Judge: Sheldrick, Emily |
|
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Schedule AMENDED |
|
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Order for Continuance of Trial Date | |
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Citation THIRD AMENDED |
|
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Citation SECOND AMENDED |
|
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Citation AMENDED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.