Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Boice, Sherry, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Derricott, Mark Roland, against Donnor, Jane Doe, Donnor, Nathan Tennyson, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, WA, . Clark County, WA Superior Courts with Nancy N. Retsinas presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNancy N. Retsinas Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 08, 2022 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice OF APPOINTMENT AS ARBITRATOR |
|
March 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Assignment for Arbitration Setting CMP FILED 09/08/22, FEE PAID |
|
March 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Statement of Arbitrability | |
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Scheduling Conference P Judge: Retsinas, Nancy N |
|
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Answer and Affirmative Defense | |
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Demand for Jury 12 Person FEE NOT PAID |
|
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
October 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Assignment | |
October 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Information Cover Sheet | |
September 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.