Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
U.S. Bank National Association, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Joslow, Maya Jessie Frances, against Abe, Mariko S, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, WA, . Clark County, WA Superior Courts with Derek J. Vanderwood presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDerek J. Vanderwood Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2022 |
CategoryCol Collection |
Last RefreshedOctober 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationClark County, WA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Order | |
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion | |
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Stricken In Court Other Reason | |
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Scheduling Conference
Judge: Vanderwood, Derek J |
|
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Default Judgment | |
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Default Judgment | |
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion for Default | |
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Scheduling Conference P Judge: Vanderwood, Derek J |
|
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment AMENDED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.