Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Baynard-Cooke, Sara E filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, WA, . Clark County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2022 |
CategoryXrp Extreme Risk Protection Order |
Last RefreshedSeptember 19, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationClark County, WA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing ERPO Hearing Judge: Vanderwood, Derek J |
|
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Extreme Risk Protection Order 1 year
Judge: Vanderwood, Derek J |
|
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Protection Order
Judge: Snider, Jennifer K |
|
September 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Declaration Affidavit | |
September 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Return of Service | |
September 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
September 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Petition for Extreme Risk Protection Order | |
September 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Extreme Risk Protection Order
Judge: Snider, Jennifer K |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.