Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Hard Notched Customs, Llc, filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case represented by Leatham, Stephen Garrett, against Western Structures, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, WA, . Clark County, WA Superior Courts with Derek J. Vanderwood presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDerek J. Vanderwood Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2022 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedOctober 26, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, WA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing #2 P/ MT AND DECLARATION FOR SUPPLEMENTAL PROCEEDINGS Judge: Vanderwood, Derek J |
|
April 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
April 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
April 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Regarding Supplemental Proceedings | |
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion and Affidavit Declaration | |
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Scheduling Conference P Judge: Gregerson, David E |
|
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Stricken In Court Other Reason | |
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing for Supplemental Proceedings Examination (P) *fr 12-2 to 12-9* *fr 12-9 to 1-6* Judge: Retsinas, Nancy N |
|
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Cancelled Plaintiff Prosecution Requested | |
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Stricken In Court Other Reason |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.